THE GREIG TRUST

Charity number: 1160318
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Grant Giving Foundation to promote education in accordance with the principles and practices of the Church of England in the following priority; I) St Mary's CE Primary School, Hornsey 2) Greig City Academy in LB Haringey 3) C of E Schools which educate children from LB Haringey 4 Children and young persons under 25 years from LB Haringey in promotion of the objects of the charity

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £287,466
Total expenditure: £1,306,991

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Haringey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 October 2002: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • THE GRIEG TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW MICHAEL BAKER Chair 04 February 2015
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF HORNSEY PARISH CHURCH (THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST GEORGE HORNSEY) LONDON DIOCESE
Received: On time
Rosetta Perle Dominique Dyer Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Dr Venetia Lynette Brown Trustee 01 September 2024
None on record
Philip John Harnett Trustee 10 June 2024
None on record
Inigo Rodney Milman Woolf Trustee 03 October 2022
HAMPSTEAD CHURCHES YOUTH COMMITTEE
Received: On time
THE HAMPSTEAD CHURCH MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
JOSEPH FOX
Received: On time
BISHOP OF LONDON'S FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN-AT-HAMPSTEAD
Received: On time
ST CLEMENT DANES EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Penny Claire Roberts MBE Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Archdeacon John Edward Inskipp Hawkins Trustee 22 May 2019
None on record
Rev BRUCE BATSTONE Trustee 04 February 2015
THE HORNSEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE HORNSEY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES
Recently registered
NORTH LONDON PASTORAL ASSISTANTS SCHEME
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £398.93k £310.13k £263.39k £248.53k £287.47k
Total expenditure £730.39k £916.32k £842.01k £900.23k £1.31m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 01 March 2023 29 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2023 366 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 01 February 2023 366 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 15 MARCH 1985 AS AMENDED 23 NOVEMBER 2001. AS AMENDED ON 03 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE SCHOOL SITE UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A CITY ACADEMY WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATION ACTS IN WHICH RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION SHALL BE GIVEN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON - HARINGEY
Registration history
  • 14 October 2002 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
34 DALKEITH GROVE
STANMORE
HA7 4SG
Phone:
02089585390