ARCA GENERATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ARCA generation offers a range of recreational and educational activities that are provided for the purpose of social welfare. This includes sports, social activities, courses, workshops and seminars aimed at creating an opportunity for young people to improve their chances and quality of life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Total income includes £30,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
Governance
- ARCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.89k | £63.26k | £60.84k | £90.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.95k | £52.84k | £61.41k | £93.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £14.40k | £30.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 09 November 2019 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 09 November 2019 | 9 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window