THE TECH PARTNERSHIP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Total income:
£2,452,657
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.20m | |
Other trading activities | £252.32k | |
Investments | £4.37k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,431,169
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £3.24m | |
Other | £189.18k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £848,290 from government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £189.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.24m |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 April 2015: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- E-SKILLS UK; THE TECH INDUSTRY PARTNERSHIP (Working name)
- THE TECH PARTNERSHIP (Previous name)
- THE TECH PARTNERSHIP LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.15m | £2.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.54m | £3.43m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.69m | £848.29k | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £64.44k | £252.32k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.09m | £2.20m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.52k | £4.37k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.54m | £3.24m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £48.36k | £86.17k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £189.18k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £16.52k | £268.08k | |
|
Long-term investments | £1 | £1 | |
|
Other assets | £7.79m | £4.87m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.97m | £1.28m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 08 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 08 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 12 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 12 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 JUN 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 MAR 2015 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 APR 2015 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 27 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: A. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND TO PROMOTE COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY, IN PARTICULAR THE INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY AND DIGITAL INDUSTRIES AND INFORMATION AND TECHNOLOGY AND DIGITAL ASPECTS OF COMMERCE AND INDUSTRY GENERALLY (TOGETHER REFERRED TO AS “THE SECTOR”), FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 1. PROMOTING AND ADVANCING THE TRAINING AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN GENERAL, AND OF PEOPLE OF ANY AGE WHO ARE EMPLOYED OR INTENDING TO BE EMPLOYED IN THE SECTOR, INCLUDING IDENTIFYING TRAINING NEEDS, DEVELOPING APPRENTICESHIPS, QUALIFICATIONS, EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND RELATED OCCUPATIONAL STANDARDS AND COMPETENCY FRAMEWORKS; 2. TAKING STEPS TO ALLEVIATE ANY SKILLS GAPS AND ANTICIPATE FUTURE TRAINING NEEDS WITHIN THE SECTOR; 3. PROMOTING DIVERSITY AND GENDER EQUALITY, AND IN PARTICULAR THE TRAINING AND PARTICIPATION OF WOMEN AND OTHER UNDERREPRESENTED GROUPS, IN THE SECTOR; 4. PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO SKILL LEVELS AND SKILLS REQUIREMENTS WITHIN THE SECTOR AND THE PUBLICATION OF THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. B. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER OBJECTS, AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window