THE CHILTERNS DIAL-A-RIDE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide concessionary transport for people with mobility problems in Chiltern, Wycombe and S Bucks Districts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 11 May 2015: CIO registration
- CDAR (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID JOHN DELAHAIZE OUVRY | Chair | 22 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Makinson | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Regester | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £285.32k | £277.81k | £176.96k | £85.00k | £69.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £258.79k | £223.77k | £257.14k | £52.22k | £69.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £102.48k | £102.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £48.01k | £31.12k | £117.84k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 11 May 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROVIDE AN AFFORDABLE, ACCESSIBLE AND SAFE TRANSPORT SERVICE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN OR CLOSE TO THE CHILTERN HILLS WHO HAVE MOBILITY PROBLEMS AND HAVE DIFFICULTY TO OR ARE UNABLE TO USE THEIR OWN OR PUBLIC TRANSPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Room 5a
Chalfont Grove
Narcot Lane
Chalfont St. Peter
Bucks
SL9 8TN
- Phone:
- 01494766123
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window