Accounts and annual returns CENTRAL GERMAN SHEPHERD RESCUE

Charity number: 1161944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 May 2024 21 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2024 21 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 24 May 2023 13 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2023 13 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 24 May 2022 27 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2022 27 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 24 May 2021 23 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2021 23 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 24 May 2020 04 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 24 May 2020 04 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window