Financial history CENTRAL GERMAN SHEPHERD RESCUE

Charity number: 1161944
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/05/2020 24/05/2021 24/05/2022 24/05/2023 24/05/2024
Total gross income £33.80k £25.69k £20.00k £23.29k £24.37k
Total expenditure £30.02k £22.19k £19.14k £24.91k £18.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.25k N/A N/A N/A N/A