CENTRAL GERMAN SHEPHERD RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue & Rehoming of GSD and GSD crosses. CGSR will not be involved in the importation of foreign dogs. All dogs will be microchipped, flead, wormed & vaccinated. Adoption fees will be used for veterinary treatment, spay, castration and kennel fees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 June 2015: CIO registration
- CGSR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Margaret Kozak | Trustee | 05 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
KYM MARIE FRANCE | Trustee | 12 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
BEV Rowe | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/05/2020 | 24/05/2021 | 24/05/2022 | 24/05/2023 | 24/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.80k | £25.69k | £20.00k | £23.29k | £24.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.02k | £22.19k | £19.14k | £24.91k | £18.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.25k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 May 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 May 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 May 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 May 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 May 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 02 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, IN PARTICULAR THE RESCUE OF GERMAN SHEPHERD, CROSS BREED GERMAN SHEPHERD AND PUPPIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR THOSE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN SUCH MATTERS PERTAINING TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING TO THIS BREED OF ANIMAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Jener
Strongs Bank
Holbeach Fen
Holbeach
SPALDING
Lincolns
- Phone:
- 07555403504
- Email:
- info@cgsr.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window