Financial history HIMMAH

Charity number: 1161021
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £120.10k £153.94k £283.25k £449.58k £671.61k
Total expenditure £59.43k £154.95k £234.83k £499.63k £617.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.39k £30.60k N/A £121.80k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £65.64k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £255.54k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £350.44k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £181.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £53.39k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £382.46k