HIMMAH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Food Bank Hot Meals Research Advocacy Campaigning Hate Crime Heritage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£671,614
Donations and legacies | £65.64k | |
Charitable activities | £255.54k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £350.44k |
Total expenditure:
£617,534
Raising funds | £53.39k | |
Charitable activities | £181.69k | |
Other | £382.46k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £121,800 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £435.84k | |
Charitable expenditure | £181.69k | |
Retained for future use | £54.08k |
People

11 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
62 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 March 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shoaib Khan | Chair | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Baba Njie | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Isa Truchet | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Iftikhar Ahmed | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
FERZANA SHAN | Trustee | 23 March 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.10k | £153.94k | £283.25k | £449.58k | £671.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.43k | £154.95k | £234.83k | £499.63k | £617.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.39k | £30.60k | N/A | £121.80k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £65.64k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £255.54k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £350.44k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £181.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £53.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £382.46k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.79k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £117.61k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.07k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
1. TO PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY IN NOTTINGHAM AND ALL OVER THE UK, HELPING PEOPLE WHO LIVE IN POVERTY BY SUPPLYING THEM WITH FOOD THROUGH THE MEANS A FOOD BANK. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY PROVIDING LANGUAGE CLASSES SUCH AS ENGLISH, ARABIC AND URDU IN NOTTINGHAM AND ALL OVER THE UK TO THOSE WHO ARE LACKING COMPREHENSION IN THESE LANGUAGES BY PROVIDING REGULAR CLASSES IN THESE DISCIPLINES. 3. TO ADVANCE THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE OR RELIGION IN NOTTINGHAM AND ALL OVER THE UK, HELPING THOSE WHO ARE DISCRIMINATED AGAINST BY CARRYING OUT RESEARCH WHICH WILL AID UNDERSTANDING OF DIFFERENT RACES AND RELIGIONS. 4. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES OF NOTTINGHAM AND THE REST OF THE UK IN SUCH A WAY THAT MEMBERS ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND MEET THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY BY PROVIDING CAPACITY BUILDING AND LEADERSHIP SKILLS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Units 4 and 5 Forest Court
Gamble Street
Nottingham
NG7 4EX
- Phone:
- 0115 837 6116
- Email:
- info@himmah.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window