RUNNYMEDE MAGNA CARTA LEGACY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RAISING FUNDS FOR THE CONSTRUCTION AND ERECTION OF A STATUE OF HM THE QUEEN AND ONGOING PROMOTIONOF MAGNA CARTA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 02 March 2015: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Japneet Kaur Cohi | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Roger Hulley | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
HUGH WALTER VELLACOTT MEARES | Trustee | 23 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BECK | Trustee | 24 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bernard Tuley | Trustee | 27 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.17k | £4.84k | £3.10k | £4.47k | £9.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 26 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 14 April 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 MAY 2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 11/01/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/02/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC REGARDING THE SEALING OF MAGNA CARTA AND ITS HISTORY, AT RUNNYMEDE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH A PROGRAMME OF ACTIVITIES, EVENTS, AND THE INSTALLATION AND MAINTENANCE OF A STATUE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 ABBEY ROAD
CHERTSEY
KT16 8AL
- Phone:
- 01932848408
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window