Accounts and annual returns DORSTONE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity Number: 505556
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 23 April 2024 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 February 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required