PLAYBACK THEATRE SOUTH WEST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Playback Theatre South West creates opportunities for communities of people to engage with issues that affect their lives in workshops and performances. Creative theatre activities support refugees; young carers; people with learning difficulties or mental health issues; women who have experienced domestic abuse; and women's organisations in the South West of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Dorset
- Plymouth City
- Somerset
- Torbay
Governance
- 14 May 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JET GRETA KAMPHUIS | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILL LEWIS | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
KATIE ELIZABETH CHAPLIN | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS JOHN PORTER BA HONS | Trustee | 29 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.59k | £2.50k | £59.55k | £91.65k | £43.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.85k | £23.12k | £41.83k | £82.91k | £83.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £100 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 May 2015
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION BY SUPPORTING THOSE WHO ARE, OR AT RISK OF BECOMING, SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM IN INTEGRATING INTO SOCIETY, TO INCLUDE BUT NOT BE LIMITED TO, CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, ASYLUM SEEKERS AND REFUGEES, PEOPLE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, PEOPLE AFFECTED BY MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES AND PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES; 2.TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY UNDERTAKING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS AND ENABLING PEOPLE OF ALL GENDERS TO ENGAGE WITH ISSUES OF GENDER DIFFERENCE AND INEQUALITY. IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING THE OPPORTUNITY AND ENVIRONMENT FOR PEOPLE TO SHARE THEIR ENLIGHTENING STORIES, IDEAS, EMOTIONS AND EXPERIENCES, PRINCIPALLY THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF PLAYBACK THEATRE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN DEVON AND BEYOND. PLAYBACK THEATRE IS A PARTICIPATORY IMPROVISATIONAL THEATRE FORM DESIGNED TO STRENGTHEN COMMUNITIES, BUILD RESILIENCE AND ENABLE POSITIVE CHANGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23
Denys Road
Totnes
TQ9 5TJ
- Phone:
- 07875097209
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window