MAXIMUS FOUNDATION UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
No-for-profit enterprise to support community groups and charities that share our aims and values. We are able to make significant investments to great causes across the UK. We do this by providing one-off grants to not-for-profit organisations that share our commitment to helping disadvantaged groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 February 2015: Standard registration
- 01 August 2024: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 01 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1198262 MAXIMUS FOUNDATION UK
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.79k | £40.61k | £248.14k | £26.63k | £46.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.64k | £100.07k | £83.68k | £100.15k | £47.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 July 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 07 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 NOV 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE OBJECTS) ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF THOSE IN NEED IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MAKING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window