EBENEZER BAPTIST CHURCH (SWANSEA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Morning & evening Sunday Services Bible Study & Prayer Meeting Sunday School, children's & Young People's meetings Mother & Toddlers' Group Ladies' & Mens' Meetings Visiting of & distribution of literature to local community Open Air literature stall Christianity Explored courses Support (financially, practically & in prayer) of other Christian workers/organizations in the UK & overseas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £980 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 15 December 2014: CIO registration
- 10 December 2015: Funds received from 1141088 EBENEZER BAPTIST CHURCH (SWANSEA)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wilfred John Matthews | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emmanuel Owoso | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frederick David Tucker | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Watkins | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL PHILLIP TOWERS | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN HARVEY | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.70k | £125.25k | £147.61k | £209.70k | £148.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.22k | £132.49k | £126.56k | £230.06k | £141.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £900 | £980 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 15 Dec 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH AND FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EBENEZER BAPTIST CHURCH
Ebenezer Street
SWANSEA
SA1 5BJ
- Phone:
- 07720 636386
- Email:
- secretary@ebenezer.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window