LITTLE PEOPLE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HOLD TWO EVENTS EACH YEAR; WHERE WE PROVIDE AN INCLUSIVE/EQUAL SOCIAL ENVIRONMENT, OPEN TO EVERYONE AFFECTED BY DWARFISM. DESIGNED LEAFLETS, POSTERS, A WEBSITE AND VIDEOS, SHARING INFORMATION REGARDING DWARFISM AND THE PEOPLE WITHIN LITTLE PEOPLE UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 2015: CIO registration
- 15 October 2020: Funds received from 1151829 LITTLE PEOPLE UK
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Adam Gordon Smith | Chair | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Annabelle Levi Davis | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Walker | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Harrison Warwick Davis | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Kate Smith | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Webb | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
CHARLIE MCGREAL | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simeon John Dyer | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Kingsley-Jones | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Marie Webb | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Thorneycroft | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gabriela Boyle | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.57k | £29.61k | £41.25k | £51.48k | £90.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.21k | £32.55k | £47.51k | £80.35k | £65.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 13 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 13 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 15 APR 2015 AMENDED ON 02 OCT 2016 AMENDED ON 03 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
1) THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONGST PEOPLE (AND THEIR FAMILIES) WITH ANY TYPE OF DWARFISM, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF EMOTIONAL, EDUCATIONAL AND SOCIAL SUPPORT. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF DWARFISM, IN PARTICULAR NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF AN EDUCATIONAL WEBSITE AND FORUM FOR MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS. 3) THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A) SEEKING TO ELIMINATE DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF DISABILITY, PARTICULARLY WITH REGARD TO DWARFISM; B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS OF DWARFISM; AND C) CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WITH REGARD TO PEOPLE WITH DWARFISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 1292
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 2NT
- Phone:
- 07925893398
- Email:
- admin@littlepeopleuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window