ALDER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Alder Trust aim is to enable the community to thrive. We do this by reaching out and enabling more services to be accessible to the highly deprived areas within Southampton. We enable a collaborative environment for those in the third sector and the private sector to work together and use one another's resources to save on funding and make services more sustainable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
550 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- ALDER TRUST ENTERPRISE (Working name)
- Aldermoor Community Farm (Working name)
- Firgrove and the Lilies (Working name)
- Aldermoor Farm (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Hull | Trustee | 11 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BARCLAY | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Anthony Andrew Arthur | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|||||
SHEELAGH CLARKE | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip James Clarke | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.49k | £154.88k | £225.29k | £375.53k | £215.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £91.77k | £148.05k | £235.08k | £288.78k | £277.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 23 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 22 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 DEC 2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE: 1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, AND TO RELIEVE NEED IN INDIVIDUALS ARISING FROM THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES; 2. TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF MEMBERS OF DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; AND 3. FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF COMMUNITIES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
107 FIRGROVE ROAD
SOUTHAMPTON
SO15 3ET
- Phone:
- 02380 783134
- Email:
- admin@aldertrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window