MISSION VIEW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Mission View hosts programs throughout the year to educate the community about nonviolence, civic engagement, and sustainable development. We work with other organisations to organize the Voices of Hope. Autism awareness, Workshops in and around United Kingdom which include community film screenings. We also partner with schools and other Community organizations/groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
People

4 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Camden
- City Of London
- Enfield
- Hackney
- Haringey
- Islington
- Newham
- Tower Hamlets
- Djibouti
- Kenya
- Somalia
Governance
- 23 June 2015: CIO registration
- MISSION VIEW MEDIA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HENNI HASSAN | Chair | 15 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
NUUR MAXAMED | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
HALIMO ABDISAMAD | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
NABIIL NUR MA MEDIA | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.65k | £10.65k | £24.85k | £21.27k | £20.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.98k | £10.38k | £24.20k | £19.73k | £20.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 209 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 575 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 940 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1305 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 23 Jun 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG MEMBERS OF DEPRIVED COMMUNITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING, POVERTY AND DISTRESS ARISING THROUGH CONFLICT ON A NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL SCALE BY PROVIDING INFORMATION AND ADVICE AS WELL AS TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES FOR PEOPLE IN CHARITABLE NEED TO ENABLE THEM ACQUIRE BETTER SKILLS, IMPROVE THEIR JOB PROSPECTS OR SET UP A BUSINESS AND EARN ENOUGH INCOME TO IMPROVE THEIR STANDARD OF LIVING AND HELP THEIR COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FINSBURY PARK COMMUNITY HUB
ANDOVER COMMUNITY CENTRE
CORKER WALK
LONDON
N7 7RY
- Phone:
- 02080903500
- Email:
- missionviewmedia@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window