Financial history HAZEL HILL TRUST

Charity number: 1160691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £268.00k £197.19k £103.52k £106.03k £96.21k
Total expenditure £151.80k £122.95k £192.66k £112.68k £110.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A