EVESHAM ARTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Evesham Arts Assoc. works to provide live amateur and professional arts events including concerts, musicals, drama, film, dance etc. We also hold exhibitions covering photography and art to encourage local talent.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 30 September 1976: Standard registration
- Evesham Live! (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR CHRIS BLOOMFIELD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ryan Jackson | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Laurence Westbury | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Hanlon | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hanlon | Trustee | 12 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robinson | Trustee | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
NEAL CARTWRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH NORLEDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.79k | £16.90k | £19.92k | £30.90k | £19.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £235.39k | £24.06k | £19.40k | £34.31k | £25.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.39k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AMENDED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUNE 1976
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE, AND THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF EVESHAM AND DISTRICT (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT).FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE AMENDED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JUNE 1976.
Area of benefit
EVESHAM AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Hawser Road
Tewkesbury
Hereford
GL20 7FA
- Phone:
- 07876297898
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window