Financial history The Sevenoaks CPR Charity

Charity number: 1160252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 03/03/2020 03/03/2021 03/03/2022 03/03/2023 03/03/2024
Total gross income £8.71k £2.60k £2.30k £5.34k £1.26k
Total expenditure £8.72k £3.40k £4.84k £4.24k £2.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A