KEHILLAH NORTH LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS SERVICES, EDUCATION, BEFRIENDING, SOCIAL ACTION
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 September 2015: CIO registration
- 24 January 2019: Funds received from 1097713 NORTH LONDON PROGRESSIVE JEWISH COMMUNITY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Imogen Resnick | Chair | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Myers | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saul Hyman | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Kal-Weiss | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Thrale | Trustee | 24 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Elton | Trustee | 05 July 2020 |
|
|||||
Kayla Lean | Trustee | 05 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HELEN MAYA LUKES | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH REINER | Trustee | 16 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Freudenthal | Trustee | 07 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.25k | £53.96k | £56.81k | £64.69k | £85.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.22k | £51.52k | £47.23k | £58.66k | £60.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 03 January 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 03 January 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 16 January 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 16 January 2023 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 14 Sep 2015
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PROGRESSIVE JUDAISM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kehillah North London
PO Box 78956
LONDON
N4 9LZ
- Phone:
- 02039518113
- Email:
- info@kehillah.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window