Financial history THE REECE HAWLEY FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1161933
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £16.05k £20.42k £1.27k £7.12k £21.85k
Total expenditure £11.34k £16.57k £8.01k £14.69k £19.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A