SEAHAM YOUTH CENTRE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth and community work. Activities as described in section 2 of constitutional document.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
Governance
- 21 April 1977: Standard registration
- 10 December 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 10 December 2015: Funds transferred to 1163327 SEAHAM YOUTH CENTRE
- SEAHAM YOUTH CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £58.42k | £64.29k | £27.13k | £45.76k | £22.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.77k | £61.76k | £34.67k | £39.45k | £28.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 01 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 15 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 01 April 2015 | 152 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 11 April 2014 | 162 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 11 April 2014 | 162 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 DECEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 14 APRIL 1977, 5 FEBRUARY 1986, 23 FEBRUARY 1994, 25 FEBRUARY 1998, 28 FEBRUARY 2001 AND 28 FEBRUARY 2007
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF RACE OR SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER BELIEF OR OPINION THROUGH LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDICIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
SEAHAM AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window