Financial history WALSALL PRIDE FOR ALL

Charity number: 1161574
Charity reporting is up to date (85 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022 28/02/2023 29/02/2024
Total gross income £11.91k £8.81k £194 £45.52k £44.50k
Total expenditure £17.15k £1.20k £109 £38.38k £42.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k N/A N/A £25.12k £15.00k