WALSALL PRIDE FOR ALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Walsall Pride for All is a group of trustees who plan events in the local community to support the LGBTQ community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £15,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Walsall
Governance
- 07 May 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW PHILIP HARPER | Chair | 26 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW RICHARD HIGGINS | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
ZAC HUMPAGE | Trustee | 26 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL LOUISE PEARCE-PLATER | Trustee | 26 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANNE HARPER | Trustee | 26 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.91k | £8.81k | £194 | £45.52k | £44.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.15k | £1.20k | £109 | £38.38k | £42.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | £25.12k | £15.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 24 March 2025 | 85 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 24 March 2025 | 85 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 29 January 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 29 January 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 23 February 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 06 January 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 07 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 NOV 2014
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ACROSS WALSALL (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY:- (A) IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING AND STAGING AN ANNUAL LGBT FESTIVAL WITH ADDITIONAL SMALLER EVENTS THROUGHOUT THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITH THE SUPPORT OF THE LOCAL BUSINESS, VOLUNTEERS AND THE COMMUNITY; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING GENERAL AWARENESS AMONG THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ISSUES AND CHALLENGES FACING THE LIVES OF THE LGBT COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (C) ASSOCIATING WITH VOLUNTARY, PUBLIC AND PRIVATE SECTOR ORGANISATIONS TO DEVELOP AND MAXIMISE THE EFFECTIVENESS OF THE CHARITY FOR LGBT PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; (LGBT STANDS FOR LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL AND TRANSGENDER PEOPLE, AND REFERS TO SEXUAL ORIENTATION AND GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT, BOTH PROTECTED CHARACTERISTICS UNDER THE EQUALITY ACT 2010)
Area of benefit
WALSALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Queen Mary Street
WALSALL
WS1 4AB
- Phone:
- 08432897046
- Email:
- info@walsallpride.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window