CAMP JESUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates throughout Greater London, we carry out different outreach activities such as our Homeless outreach where we go to different areas of London and provide the homeless with small care packs. We also have monthly meetings where we share the word of God and allow time for worship and music sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 January 2015: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Patel | Trustee | 03 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1193 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1558 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 30 Jan 2015
Charitable objects
CAMP JESUS IS A MINISTRY FOUNDED BY A GROUP OF PEOPLE WHO ARE PASSIONATE ABOUT SEEING THE NAME OF JESUS SPREAD ACROSS COMMUNITIES AND CITIES WITH THE PRIMARY PURPOSE OF ADVANCING THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN LONDON (PRIMARILY) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, WORSHIP MEETINGS DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE, SUCH AS BIBLES AND OTHER BOOKS ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN PEOPLE ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND GIVE ACCESS TO THE MESSAGE OF CHRIST TO THOSE WHO MAY NOT HAVE ACCESS. OUR PURPOSE IS TO SEEK NEW FOLLOWERS AND ENCOURAGE PEOPLE TO FELLOWSHIP IN THE NAME OF JESUS IN SUCH A WAY THAT IS NOT FORCEFUL OR PRESSURISING. WE BELIEVE THIS OFFERS PEOPLE A CHANCE TO DEVELOP THEMSELVES SPIRITUALLY, HAVING A FORUM TO FELLOWSHIP WITH OTHER BELIEVERS AND PROVIDING EDUCATION OF MORAL BASIS, WHICH CAN HOPEFULLY PREVENT MUCH OF THE NEGATIVITY SEEN IN SOCIETY TODAY. OUR AIMS ARE TO USE THE EXAMPLES SET IN THE CHRISTIAN FAITH BY JESUS CHRIST TO TAKE OUR COMPASSION THE STREET TO HELP THE HOMELESS, YOUTH AND PRISONERS TO OFFER THEM HOPE AND LOVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 MEADVALE ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 6JY
- Phone:
- 07536021794
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window