Financial history SHAP COMMUNITY CIO

Charity Number: 1160966
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £45.53k £23.47k £18.23k £20.67k £13.02k
Total expenditure £41.24k £8.65k £13.22k £24.55k £13.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £18.50k £19.67k £11.32k £3.91k £1.00k