MINISTRY OF MUSIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We facilitate Christian singers, bands and worship leaders to perform music, lead worship, provide training and give the Christian message at events and other settings. We can also provide PA/lighting equipment & sound/lighting engineers. Events include community outreach, youth, schools, church services, cafe church, conferences, festivals & training workshops/seminars.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 August 2015: CIO registration
- 20 December 2023: Funds received from 1042827 NEXT STEP MINISTRIES TRUST
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GREG WESTON | Trustee | 27 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ALEC MAIDMENT | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Philip Meacham | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.13k | £9.05k | £7.20k | £7.07k | £7.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.06k | £11.07k | £6.66k | £7.77k | £7.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 01 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 04 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 27 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC MAINLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY (A) FACILITATING CHRISTIAN ARTISTS TO PERFORM MUSIC, LEAD WORSHIP, PROVIDE TRAINING AND GIVE THE CHRISTIAN MESSAGE AT EVENTS AND OTHER SETTINGS (B) THE DEVELOPMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF CHRISTIAN ARTISTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Estuary Drive
FELIXSTOWE
IP11 9TL
- Phone:
- 07725420561
- Email:
- info@ministryofmusic.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window