YORKSHIRE INDIAN SOCIETY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Yorkshire Indian Society through its members organize large scale banquet dinners annually to raise funds to help allow the Charitable Trust to meet its objectives. This involves getting together local Yorkshire and Indian-based residents and support and sponsorship from businesses to help make the event highly successful. An attendance of over 500 people from various backgrounds is the norm.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 07 July 2015: Standard registration
- YIS (Working name)
- YORKSHIRE INDIAN SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ramakrishnan Venkatesh MBBS MS | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Joji Joseph | Trustee | 07 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr RAJEEEVA KUMAR SINGH | Trustee | 29 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr AMARJEET SINGH MBBS MRCP | Trustee | 29 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ATUL KUMAR TYAGI MBBS MS | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr MALIKAYIL ALEXANDER MBBS FRP | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr MAHENDRA PATEL FRPharmS | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.38k | £11.27k | £3.02k | £11.04k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.07k | £11.05k | £0 | £6.00k | £9.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/04/2015
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY MEANS OF MAKING GRANTS 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH OR SAVING OF LIVES BY MEANS OF THE MAKING OF GRANTS 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY MEANS OF THE MAKING OF GRANTS THESE OBJECTS SHALL BE CARRIED OUT WITHIN THE COUNTRIES OF UK AND INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 MARRIOTT GROVE
WAKEFIELD
WF2 6RP
- Phone:
- 07977492229
- Email:
- yorksindiansoc@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window