FAITH LIFE CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Christian faith for the benefit of the public in accordance with the belief in the Father, Son and Holy Spirit. The relief and assistance of people in any part of the world who are the victims of natural or other kinds of disaster, trouble or catastrophe in particular by the provision of money. Meeting place is :Allfoxton Road. Bristol. BS7 9NJ
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 17 June 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacob Kehinde Adegoke Oyenuga | Trustee | 21 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
LILLIAN NYAHUNZVI | Trustee | 22 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR BASIL | Trustee | 22 July 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.50k | £7.07k | £983 | £9.00k | £11.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.23k | £7.18k | £10.14k | £7.20k | £12.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 December 2024 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 06 December 2024 | 647 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JUL 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/06/2015
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BELIEF IN THE FATHER, SON AND HOLY SPIRIT. 2. THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER, TROUBLE, OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) INCLUDING THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS IN ORDER TO PREVENT SICKNESS AND DISEASE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Faith Life Church International
Allfoxton Road
Bristol
BS7 9NJ
- Phone:
- 07765706262
- Email:
- nyhnzv_bsl@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window