SEND FAMILY VOICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a voluntary organisation run by parents of children and young people with special needs and disabilities. We empower families by connecting parents and carers with a wider network of support and information and we actively reach out to families to listen to their experiences and views. Using the information we gather we are able to create a strong, representative parent voice.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kingston Upon Thames
- Richmond Upon Thames
Governance
- RICHMOND SEND FAMILY VOICE (Previous name)
- SEND FAMILY VOICE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.76k | £49.42k | £33.28k | £1.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.79k | £34.31k | £38.62k | £14.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £30.00k | £30.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 28 June 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 28 June 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 12 June 2019 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 12 June 2019 | 132 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 10 July 2018 | 160 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | 10 July 2018 | 160 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 27 March 2017 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 27 March 2017 | 55 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 16 APR 2015 AMENDED ON 08/01/2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND DISABILITIES AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND AND THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 1. PROVIDING SPECIALIST ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO SUCH CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES 2. WORKING IN PARTNERSHIP WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY (ACHIEVING FOR CHILDREN) AND OTHER PUBLIC SERVICES TO DEVELOP MEASURABLE CHANGES AND IMPROVEMENTS OF SUCH CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF RICHMOND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window