Trustees ABBEY COURT SCHOOL TRUST
Charity number: 1160511

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lydia Ogundolawa | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Aspin | Trustee | 25 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Linda Davis | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek King | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev JEAN KERR MA CERT ED | Trustee | 20 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sue Vallente-Kerr | Trustee | 22 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
KAREN JOY | Trustee | 14 August 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.