MARITIME CADET ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to create an environment where young people aged 8-18 can reach their full potential whatever their circumstances. We provide a balanced programme of activities that develops the whole person in an environment of social interaction and team working, using a nautical theme based on the customs and traditions of the Royal and Merchant Navies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnet
- Cornwall
- Derbyshire
- Gloucestershire
- Hampshire
- Herefordshire
- Kent
- Waltham Forest
- Wirral
- Worcestershire
Governance
- MCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAPTAIN Richard William Edward TYRRELL | Chair | 15 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Mander | Trustee | 20 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Keith Coleman | Trustee | 22 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEANNE MARALYN EVANS | Trustee | 15 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2018 | 01/04/2019 | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.54k | £2.79k | £2.31k | £1.41k | £564 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.92k | £2.88k | £1.89k | £1.51k | £837 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days | |
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 31 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09 APR 2014 AS AMENDED ON 22/02/2015
Charitable objects
TO ACT AS AN UMBRELLA ORGANISATION IN SUPPORT OF INDEPENDENT NAUTICAL YOUTH TRAINING ORGANISATIONS FOR YOUNG PEOPLE FROM THE AGE OF 18 TO 18 BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A)ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B)ADVANCING EDUCATION; (C)RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (D)PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Jamaica Crescent
MALVERN
WR14 1LZ
- Phone:
- 01684577851
- Email:
- captain@maritimecadets.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window