MANCHESTER TRANSPORT MUSEUM SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tramway museum for the Manchester area and operating tramway in Heaton Park, Manchester
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Manchester City
Governance
- 14 January 1980: Standard registration
- HEATON PARK TRAMWAY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFFREY SENIOR | Chair |
|
||||||
Joshua James Haworth | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian David Polkinghorne | Trustee | 12 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Martin | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Edward Ainscow | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chistopher John Unsworth | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
IAN ANDREW WRIGHT | Trustee | 14 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Jeremy Valentine | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.45k | £19.48k | £31.55k | £25.89k | £15.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.56k | £11.77k | £14.35k | £17.37k | £12.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £13.40k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/10/1979 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/05/2015
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC A TRAMWAY AND TRANSPORT MUSEUM AND FOR THE LIKE PURPOSE TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION OF TRAMWAY AND ASSOCIATED VEHICLES OF GENERAL INTEREST OR EQUIPMENT OR ANY OTHER ITEMS OF TRANSPORT INTEREST OR OF ACTUAL OR POTENTIAL HISTORICAL OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO ITEMS HAVING A CONNECTION WITH THE AREA COMPRISED WITHIN THE COUNTY OF GREATER MANCHESTER.
Area of benefit
MANCHESTER (PRECISE AREA NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 FOUNTAINS ROAD
CHEADLE HULME
CHEADLE
SK8 7PY
- Phone:
- 01614398203
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window