THE INTERNATIONAL SHAKESPEARE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public by furthering the study of Shakespeare's life and work by such means as the trustees determine including by: - Organising, holding and promoting participation in the World Shakespeare Congress and disseminating the learning of that event; and - Offering advice and assistance in the establishment of national or regional Shakespeare associations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 03 February 2015: CIO registration
- 22 May 2017: Funds received from 283875 THE INTERNATIONAL SHAKESPEARE ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Paraomita Chakravarti | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor David McInnis | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jacek Fabiszak | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christopher Thurman | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID HOLLAND PROFESSOR | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manuel-Alfredo Michel-Modenessi | Trustee | 24 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Atsuhiko Hirota PROFESSOR | Trustee | 24 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claudia Olk | Trustee | 24 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr BI-QI BEATRICE LEI | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr LI LAN YONG | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
GORDON ALEXANDER MCMULLAN PROFESSOR | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
TOM BISHOP | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
LINGUI YANG Professor | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
TON HOENSELAARS | Trustee | 23 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIQUE GOY-BLANQUET PROFESSOR | Trustee | 23 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
RAFIK DARRAGI PROFESSOR | Trustee | 23 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
CARLA DENTE PROFESSOR | Trustee | 12 August 2002 |
|
|
||||
LENA COWEN ORLIN PROFESSOR | Trustee | 12 August 2002 |
|
|
||||
CLARA CALVO PROFESSOR | Trustee | 12 August 2002 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.42k | £6.20k | £2.52k | £207 | £487 | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.81k | £3.80k | £105 | £125 | £136 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 17 April 2025 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 10 April 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 03 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY FURTHERING THE STUDY OF SHAKESPEARE’S LIFE AND WORK BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE INCLUDING BY: ORGANISING, HOLDING AND PROMOTING PARTICIPATION IN THE WORLD SHAKESPEARE CONGRESS AND DISSEMINATING THE LEARNING FROM THAT EVENT; AND OFFERING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE IN THE ESTABLISHMENT OF NATIONAL OR REGIONAL SHAKESPEARE ASSOCIATIONS”
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Shakespeare Birthplace Trust
Administrative Offices
38 Henley Street
Stratford-upon-Avon
United Kingdom
CV37 6QW
- Phone:
- 01789204016
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window