Trustees THE INTERNATIONAL SHAKESPEARE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1160312

Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Paraomita Chakravarti | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor David McInnis | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Jacek Fabiszak | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christopher Thurman | Trustee | 06 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID HOLLAND PROFESSOR | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manuel-Alfredo Michel-Modenessi | Trustee | 24 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Atsuhiko Hirota PROFESSOR | Trustee | 24 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claudia Olk | Trustee | 24 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr BI-QI BEATRICE LEI | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr LI LAN YONG | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
GORDON ALEXANDER MCMULLAN PROFESSOR | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
TOM BISHOP | Trustee | 23 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
LINGUI YANG Professor | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|
||||
TON HOENSELAARS | Trustee | 23 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
DOMINIQUE GOY-BLANQUET PROFESSOR | Trustee | 23 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
RAFIK DARRAGI PROFESSOR | Trustee | 23 April 2007 |
|
|
||||
CARLA DENTE PROFESSOR | Trustee | 12 August 2002 |
|
|
||||
LENA COWEN ORLIN PROFESSOR | Trustee | 12 August 2002 |
|
|
||||
CLARA CALVO PROFESSOR | Trustee | 12 August 2002 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.