Financial history UPBEAT COMMUNITIES LTD

Charity number: 1162856
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £535.14k £424.36k £568.45k £823.94k £1.11m
Total expenditure £503.47k £463.57k £566.53k £805.37k £1.01m
Income from government contracts £232.38k £122.91k £228.13k £320.29k £373.09k
Income from government grants N/A £8.00k N/A £5.83k £97.22k
Income - Donations and legacies £349.01k N/A £125.73k £236.86k £331.44k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £226.19k
Income - Charitable activities £181.10k N/A £191.83k £528.10k £549.45k
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £182 N/A £23 £0 £1.20k
Income - Other £4.85k N/A £22.74k £58.98k £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £474.34k N/A £530.14k £689.12k £750.75k
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.17k N/A £4.55k £5.04k £260.54k
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A £2.33k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £26.97k N/A £31.84k £111.21k £0