Financial history Lifespring

Charity number: 1160962
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £700.63k £516.29k £423.19k £509.63k £624.01k
Total expenditure £671.66k £604.41k £409.98k £559.20k £556.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £300 N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £570.03k £496.22k N/A £504.59k £557.70k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £129.99k £19.78k N/A £5.00k £64.10k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £604 £294 N/A £38 £2.21k
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £671.66k £604.41k N/A £559.20k £556.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £36.24k £35.49k N/A £15.17k £17.31k
Expenditure - Grants institution £119.96k £0 N/A £47.26k £41.30k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0