Financial history THE GLAMORGAN-GWENT ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 505609
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £702.41k £828.69k £823.50k £762.10k £1.23m
Total expenditure £1.16m £548.77k £433.11k £735.81k £1.41m
Income from government contracts £73.91k £87.43k £67.31k £67.94k £65.00k
Income from government grants £425.87k £576.30k £526.28k £517.57k £494.41k
Income - Donations and legacies £108.33k £114.36k £112.78k £124.92k £132.76k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £593.82k £714.32k £710.72k £637.10k £633.21k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £257 £9 £0 £79 £328
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.16m £548.77k £433.11k £735.81k £1.41m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £16.66k £23.17k £29.03k £17.95k £67.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £2.25k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0