Financial history UK SMART RECOVERY

Charity number: 1160516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £363.02k £400.34k £488.12k £495.75k £568.22k
Total expenditure £401.29k £372.92k £419.82k £443.04k £505.87k
Income from government contracts £18.64k £68.44k £69.81k £108.69k £50.00k
Income from government grants £36.50k N/A £36.50k £69.76k £76.28k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £108.15k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £32.22k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £427.84k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.25k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £78.01k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £426.54k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.32k