NORTHAMPTONSHIRE EMERGENCY RESPONSE CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Voluntary support to local authority emergency planning team and Northamptonshire emergency services if required
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 26 August 2015: CIO registration
- NERC (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Monteith Brown | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Andrew Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan George Ivey | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Hebborn | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112 | £253 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11 | £11 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 477 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 842 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 26 Aug 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY AND ANIMAL LIFE IN PARTICULAR IN THE COMMUNITY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (1) SUPPORTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF COMMUNITY EMERGENCY PLANS (2) ASSISTING LOCAL COUNCILS, EMERGENCY SERVICES AND CATEGORY 1 AND 2 RESPONDERS WITH THEIR EMERGENCY PLANNING, RESPONSE AND RECOVERY ACTIVITIES (3) PROVIDING PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE, ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO LOCAL RESIDENTS, GROUPS AND BUSINESSES; AND (4) ENCOURAGING MORE PEOPLE TO BECOME ENGAGED WITH THEIR COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY RESPONSE.
Area of benefit
NORTHAMPTIONSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Palmer Avenue
Irthlingborough
WELLINGBOROUGH
Northamptonshire
NN9 5XB
- Phone:
- 07535045462
- Email:
- Andysmith701@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window