THERAVADA BUDDHIST TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are running a temporary Buddhist Monastery located in Sheffield. Monastery is open to general public for meditation practice. People from any religion who are interested in Theravada Buddhism are welcome to attend.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- City Of London
- Manchester City
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 23 February 2015: Standard registration
- 14 May 2024: Funds received from 1141196 SITAGU INTERNATIONAL MISSIONARY TRUST
- TBT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aye Myat Phyu | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashin Gawsaka | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Khun Saing | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yin Thu Aung | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maung Maung | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Tin Maung Myint | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Soe Naing | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Win Maw | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ko Aung Myint | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr YE MYINT | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MIN MIN ZIN | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/08/2019 | 29/08/2020 | 29/08/2021 | 29/08/2022 | 29/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.71k | £45.50k | £31.34k | £47.34k | £34.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.48k | £36.36k | £14.04k | £27.44k | £20.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 August 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2020 | 13 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 August 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 DEC 2014
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE THERAVADA BUDDHISM PRACTICE IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY ENCOURAGING AND FACILITATING RELIGIOUS PRACTICE THROUGH PROVISION OF PLACE OF WORSHIP WHICH WILL HOLD RELIGIOUS CEREMONIES, MASS CHANTING OPEN TO THE PUBLIC, PRAYER MEETINGS, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS AND LONG AND SHORT-STAY RETREATS 2) TO PROMOTE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THERAVADA BUDDHISM BY PROVIDING REGULAR RELIGIOUS TEACHINGS AND MEDITATION PRACTICES FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC 3) TO PROVIDE RELIGIOUS DEVOTIONAL ACTS BY FACILITATING THE BUDDHIST REVEREND VISITING THE SICK AND ENCOURAGEMENT AND SUPPORT OF PASTORAL WORK
Contact information
- Address:
-
59 Southey Green Road
Sheffield
S5 8GU
- Phone:
- 01143487865
- Email:
- gawsaka@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window