Trustees THERAVADA BUDDHIST TRUST
Charity Number: 1160584

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Aye Myat Phyu | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashin Gawsaka | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Khun Saing | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Yin Thu Aung | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maung Maung | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Tin Maung Myint | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Soe Naing | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Win Maw | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ko Aung Myint | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr YE MYINT | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
MIN MIN ZIN | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.