Financial history YORK INDEPENDENT LIVING NETWORK

Charity number: 1160573
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £2.20k £5.15k £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £7.32k £4.35k £1.41k £72 £72
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A