UNIVERSAL PEACE FEDERATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Creates forums to explore racial and national tensions and seek reconciliation. Taught Good Governance courses and held Reconciliation Training. Held a Parenting Skills course. Commemorate UN days that foster inter-religious and inter-community understanding and cohesion. We are planning to support education for poor children in Pakistan, Mediator Training and Character Education in Nigeria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- France
- Germany
- Ireland
- Liberia
- Nigeria
- South Korea
- Ukraine
Governance
- 20 September 2019: Standard registration
- UK-UPF (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Lander Best | Chair | 20 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Actar Marandi DINATA | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Abdul Basith Pattinathar Kattuwa Syedibrahim | Trustee | 12 December 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
MARTINA COOMBS Dietician | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
MARK BRANN | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
DAVID FRASER HARRIS | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr DAVID EDWARD EARLE PH. D. | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.81k | £61.54k | £53.42k | £65.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.83k | £40.98k | £47.64k | £74.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 27 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 06 May 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 06 May 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 JUN 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: THE PROMOTION OF NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH A VIEW TO RELIEVING SUFFERING, POVERTY AND DISTRESS AND BUILDING AND MAINTAINING SOCIAL COHESION AND TRUST WITHIN AND BETWEEN COMMUNITIES BY: IDENTIFYING THE CULTURAL, RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CAUSES OF CONFLICT IN DIFFERENT PARTS OF THE WORLD AND PRODUCING REPORTS ON THE FINDINGS; BRINGING TOGETHER LEADERS AND OTHERS OF INFLUENCE WITHIN COMMUNITIES IN CONFLICT IN ORDER TO AID MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING, FOSTER DIALOGUE AND MUTUAL RESPECT AND ASSIST IN FINDING COMMON GROUND FOR AGREEMENT AND COOPERATION; PRODUCING REPORTS ON THE RESULTS OF CONFLICT RESOLUTION-RELATED ACTIVITIES INCLUDING IMPARTIAL RECOMMENDATIONS FOR ACTION; AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC FOR THE BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF HUMAN RIGHTS, PARTICIPATION IN GOVERNMENT, GOOD CITIZENSHIP, MODELS OF GOOD GOVERNANCE AND NEIGHBOURLINESS IN THE INTERESTS OF GENERAL PUBLIC BENEFIT. PROVIDED THAT ALL ACTIVITIES SHALL BE BALANCED AND SHALL MAINTAIN OR ENHANCE THE ORGANISATION’S COMMITMENT TO REMAINING IMPARTIAL. THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY AND PEACEFUL CO-EXISTENCE BETWEEN PEOPLE OF DIFFERENT RELIGIONS, CULTURES, RACES AND NATIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THE DIFFERENT BACKGROUNDS, RELIGIOUS AND OTHER BELIEFS, HELD BY DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS, RACIAL CULTURAL AND NATIONAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE MUTUAL RESPECT AND PROVIDE A BASIS FOR DIALOGUE; RUNNING EVENTS AND PROJECTS TO BRING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF DIFFERENT FAITHS AND SEPARATE GROUPS WITHIN THOSE FAITHS TO FACILITATE INTER-FAITH DIALOGUE, INCLUDING EXAMINING TOGETHER THE INTERPRETATIONS OF THEIR FAITHS AND COMMON THEMES. RUNNING PROJECTS THAT BRING TOGETHER INDIVIDUALS OF DIFFERENT BACKGROUNDS AND BELIEFS TO WORK TOGETHER FOR A COMMON GOAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 LANCASTER GATE
LONDON
W2 3NA
- Phone:
- 07956210768
- Email:
- pa@uk.upf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window