SCHOTTLANDER RESEARCH CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of health for the public benefit by supporting innovative research that will lead to a better understanding of the causes, treatment and prevention of illness and the conservation and protection of the natural environment for the public benefit by supporting innovative research into the development of sustainable energy resources and publishing the results of such research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 April 2015: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr BRIAN DENNIS SCHOTTLANDER | Chair | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Waterfall Scott | Trustee | 21 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
IAN JAMES SCHOTTLANDER | Trustee | 22 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ANN SCHOTTLANDER | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £721 | £100.41k | £100.04k | £704 | £107.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £300 | £288 | £288 | £36 | £100.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23/03/2015
Charitable objects
1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SUPPORTING INNOVATIVE RESEARCH THAT WILL LEAD TO A BETTER UNDERSTANDING OF: A)THE CAUSE OF ILLNESS; B)THE TREATMENT OF ILLNESS; AND C)THE PREVENTION OF ILLNESS AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH. 2)THE CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SUPPORTING INNOVATIVE RESEARCH INTO THE DEVELOPMENT OF SUSTAINABLE ENERGY RESOURCES AND PUBLISHING THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Schottlander & Davis
Fifth Avenue
Letchworth Garden City
SG6 2WD
- Phone:
- 07812981312
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window