BRIGHTER FUTURES ZAMBIA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention of relief of poverty of orphaned and/or otherwise vulnerable children in Zambia (especially those affected by HIV/ AIDS) by providing or assisting in the provision of education and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Zambia
Governance
- 27 July 2015: Standard registration
- BFZ (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATIE ANNE LAVENDER BA HONS | Chair | 01 January 2011 |
|
|
||||
Oritsematosan Tuoyo | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Watson | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
CIARA DEVLIN | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Leslie Widdison | Trustee | 07 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Chadelle | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Caitriona Maire Gearoidin MacLoughlin BA Hons | Trustee | 15 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY HOPPER BA HONS | Trustee | 01 January 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Ellen Smith BA HONS | Trustee | 01 January 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr THOMAS WILLIAM LAVENDER MBCHB | Trustee | 01 January 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.67k | £20.46k | £30.15k | £30.03k | £16.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.35k | £22.96k | £23.59k | £34.99k | £30.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29 JUL 2012
Charitable objects
1.PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ORPHANED AND/OR OTHERWISE VULNERABLE CHILDREN IN ZAMBIA (ESPECIALLY THOSE AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS) BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING.2.FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF ORPHANED AND/OR OTHERWISE VULNERABLE CHILDREN IN ZAMBIA (ESPECIALLY THOSE AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS) IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT, INCLUDING BY: I. AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY INSTITUTION OF EDUCATION; AND II. PROVIDING EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING AND PASTORAL SUPPORT) TO CHILDREN NOT YET ACCESSING PRIMARY EDUCATION THROUGH ASSISTANCE TO COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOLS. 3.I. TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL SICKNESS OF ORPHANED AND/OR OTHERWISE VULNERABLE CHILDREN IN ZAMBIA (ESPECIALLY THOSE AFFECTED BY HIV/AIDS) AND/OR THEIR CARERS SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT OR LOSS, BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT FOR SUCH PERSONS. II. TO ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND/OR RELEVANT SUPPORT WITH A VIEW TO ENABLING THESE CHILDREN AND THEIR CARERS TO GENERATE SUSTAINABLE INCOMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 Hawthorn Gardens
Whitley Bay
NE26 3PQ
- Phone:
- 01912921211
- Email:
- hello@bfzambia.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window