STELLAR SMART FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities to be started in June 2016
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Pakistan
- United Arab Emirates
Governance
- SMART LIFE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 |
|
Income from government grants | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 18 Feb 2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD SUCH EDUCATION, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN LIVING IN PAKISTAN BUT WITH THE VIEW TO HELPING PEOPLE IN OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Area of benefit
IN PAKISTAN BUT WITH THE VIEW TO HELPING PEOPLE IN OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window