EUROPEAN FRONTIER FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity pursues humanitarian goals in Ukraine, including provision of first aid kits, supporting hospitals and ambulance services, contributing to the cost of care for wounded and disabled and undertakes other projects of humanitarian nature
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ukraine
Governance
- EFF (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.82k | £8.17k | £10.18k | £5.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.16k | £8.59k | £9.66k | £6.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 27 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 27 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 17 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 17 August 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PROTECT HUMAN LIFE IN UKRAINE BY: O PROVISION OF FIRST AID MEDICAL PRODUCTS AND INDIVIDUAL FIRST AID KITS TO PREVENT DEATH FROM BATTLEFIELD WEAPONS AND ACTS OF TERRORISM AMONGST SERVICEMEN AND CIVILIANS O PROVISION OF MEDICAL PRODUCTS AND EQUIPMENT AND MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO SUPPORT THE HOSPITALS AND AMBULANCE SERVICES O PROVISION OF SEASONAL CLOTHING AND FOOTWEAR TO PREVENT INJURIES OR DEATH FROM HYPOTHERMIA OR HYPERTHERMIA O MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR CARE AND TREATMENT OF INJURIES AND DISABILITIES SUSTAINED BY SERVICEMEN AND CIVILIANS AS A RESULT OF WAR OR ACTS OF TERRORISM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO APPLY THE CIO RESOURCES TOWARDS OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF HUMANITARIAN NATURE IN UKRAINE AT SUCH TIME AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window