RAVENS RESCUE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of suffering and the need of abandoned, unwanted, homeless, abused or distressed animals, particularly, but not limited to, cat and dogs (a) providing sanctuary for those with medical/behavioral issues, when & where appropriate;(b) providing medical attention and treatment for rescue animals; (c) arranging responsible fostering & rehoming where appropriate
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 March 2015: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Raven Price | Chair | 14 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Penn | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Saranne Bailey | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Worton | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Baynham | Trustee | 13 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Davies | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ryan Price | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.86k | £72.08k | £83.06k | £91.71k | £134.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £67.80k | £67.91k | £90.13k | £99.46k | £86.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 19 Mar 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 1) THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND NEED OF ABANDONED, UNWANTED, HOMELESS, ABUSED OR DISTRESSED ANIMALS, PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO CATS AND DOGS, BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE INCLUDING THE FOLLOWING: A) PROVIDING SANCTUARY FOR THOSE WITH MEDICAL OR BEHAVIOURAL ISSUES, WHEN AND WHERE APPROPRIATE; B) PROVIDING MEDICAL ATTENTION AND TREATMENT FOR RESCUED ANIMALS; C) ARRANGING RESPONSIBLE FOSTERING AND RE-HOMING WHERE APPROPRIATE;
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Birds Meadow
Pensnett
BRIERLEY HILL
DY5 4TD
- Phone:
- 07922204531
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window